U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.