open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00137
    Party Name:MCCANTS v. WORTH COUNTY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Rules 16/26]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112107
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =