U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.