U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAZIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Joint Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.