U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.