U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLAKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.