U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BUTLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.