U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOWDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.