U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBINSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Revoking Voluntary Surrender]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.