U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RUSSELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.