U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:87-cr-01649-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.