U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HAYES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.