U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLEMAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.