U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SKURKA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.