U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.