U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KUHN, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.