U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLOWNEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.