U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COX, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.