U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00042-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOLLOMON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.