U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALVAREZ-CHAVEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.