U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-00127-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RAMSEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.