U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALLEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.