U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.