U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RESERVE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.