U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00058-12
  • Case Name: USA v. KEITH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Amended Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.