U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CARTER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 02, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.