U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00035-7
  • Case Name: USA v. MOORE, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Joint Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.