open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-69388-pmb
    Party Name:Felton Fedrick, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Application to Employ]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Modified Plan and of Deadlines for Objections]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Chapter 13 Monthly Income Statement/Calculation of Disposable Income Document(s) - (122C-1/122C-2)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Modification or Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Meeting of Creditors Reset - Ch. 13]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [04-Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1179016
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =