open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-12420-whd
    Party Name:Reginald Antwan Wimbush and Sherry Ferrell Wimbush
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Re: Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan - New Plan Form (12/1/17 or after)]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Trustee's Supplemental Report Requesting Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Hearing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Application to Employ]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Objection to Claim (Motion to Disallow Claim)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certification Re: Review of Proof of Claims]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Modified Plan and of Deadlines for Objections]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Modification or Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [04-Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Leave of Absence]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1179013
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =