open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-42834-pwb
    Party Name:Kyle Wesley Dotson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter Re: Outstanding Filing Fee]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Letter to Debtor re: Unpaid Filing Fees]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:January 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:January 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Dismissing Case - Failure to Correct Deficiencies]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Vacating Order - SAME DAY]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules and Statements (Fee)-case upload]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1179012
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =