open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-42833-pwb
    Party Name:Shae Management, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [08-Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Proceedings Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Ballot]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing, Motion to]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [01-Chapter 11 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement - Chapter 11]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time, Motion to]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [06-Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [01-Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of No Appointment of Creditors' Committee]
    Date Published:February 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Intervene, Motion to]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Miscellaneous Deficiencies]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Substantively Consolidate, Motion to]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Leave of Absence]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application to Employ]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule D]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules (441)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time to File Schedules, Motion to]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time to File Schedules, Application to]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1179009
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =