U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ZAVALA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.