U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SANDERS, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.