U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RAINEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.