U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GIBSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.