U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.