U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MORRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.