U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAYNE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.