U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIGHAM, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 22, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.