U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-mc-00010
  • Case Name: SATCOMM v. PAYPAL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order for Response]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.