U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCORMICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.