U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.