U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.