open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:20-20287-jrs
    Party Name:Richard Gordon Hooper and Stacey Lynn Hooper
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice Rescheduling 341 Meeting and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Stay]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Extend Stay, Motion to]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1184613
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =