open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PEREZ-VERDUGO
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standard Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Appointed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114763
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =