U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWNING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.