U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. McLENDON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.