U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NORRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.