U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00009-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GARCIA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 20, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.