U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RIVERA-RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.